Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIHAELA CALDARESCU VS ADAT ARI EL
On June 02, 2016 a premise liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 02, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Jury Verdict
Case Duration
10 months and 9 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Michelle Williams Court 8:30 am | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Michelle Williams Court 8:30 am | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Michelle Williams Court 10:00 am | |
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 314 Days | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Mihaela Caldarescu (Plaintiff) |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Adat Ari El (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Adat Ari El (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Adat Ari El (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall) | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Mihaela Caldarescu (Plaintiff) |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by null |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |