Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IBRAHIM KACHICHIAN VS CONNOR MCCARTHY STONE ET AL
On April 21, 2015 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 21, 2015
Last Refreshed
August 27, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 11 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
October 04, 2016 | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] | ||
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Ibrahim Kachichian (Plaintiff) |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] | |
September 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY OR PROVIDED PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND ORDER | ||
September 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO LIABILITY INSURANCE; AND ORDER | ||
September 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL RECORDS AND BILLS WITHOUT ACCOMPANYING EXPERT TESTIMONY; AND ORDER | ||
September 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ANY EXPERT OPINION NOT PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND ORDER | ||
September 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO RESTRICT MEDICAL BILLS TO AMOUNT PAID; AND ORDER | ||
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Connor McCarthy Stone (Legacy Party) |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO RESTRICT MEDICAL BILLS TO AMOUNT PAID; AND ORDER | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ANY EXPERT OPINION NOT PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND ORDER | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO LIABILITY INSURANCE; AND ORDER | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY OR PROVIDED PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND ORDER | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL RECORDS AND BILLS WITHOUT ACCOMPANYING EXPERT TESTIMONY; AND ORDER | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Connor McCarthy Stone (Legacy Party) |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Connor McCarthy Stone (Legacy Party) |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Connor McCarthy Stone (Legacy Party) |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR COMPLETE INDEMNITY, PARTIAL INDEMNITY, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Connor McCarthy Stone (Legacy Party) |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Connor McCarthy Stone (Legacy Party) |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CONNOR MCCARTHY STONE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ibrahim Kachichian (Plaintiff) |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |