Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BETTY BLEA VS MILLENNIUM SHOES INC
On April 21, 2015 a premises liability (e.g.slip & fall) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 21, 2015
Last Refreshed
August 27, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 8 months and 29 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 7 Unknown Event Type |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Betty Blea (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) - |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Not Held-Continued) - |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF CASE | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S [PROPOSED] EXHIBIT LIST | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S [PROPOSED] JOINT WITNESS LIST | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S [PROPOSED] JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
October 07, 2016 | Proof of Service - | ||
October 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO EXCLLIDE EVIDENCE OF ANY LOSS OF PAST OR FUTURE EARNINGS | ||
October 07, 2016 | DECLARATION OF JOHN CAMBOU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 | ||
October 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE REPTILE THEORY | ||
October 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE UNDISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY | ||
October 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S INSURANCE | ||
October 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO, 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL CONDITION, WEALTH, OR SIZE | ||
October 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES | ||
October 07, 2016 | DECLARATION OF JOHN CAMBOU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS 1-8 AND MEET AND CONFER ATTEMPT | ||
October 07, 2016 | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE PLARNTTFF'S EXPERT OPINIONS AND/OR THE BASIS OF SAID OPINIONS THAT WERE NOT PROPERLY DISCLOSED IN PLAINTIFFS EXPERT DESIGNATION AND/ | ||
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO THE VALUE OF PAST OR FUTURE MEDICAL CARE BASED ON UNADJUSTED TOTAL CHARGES | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE PLARNTTFF'S EXPERT OPINIONS AND/OR THE BASIS OF SAID OPINIONS THAT WERE NOT PROPERLY DISCLOSED IN PLAINTIFFS EXPERT DESIGNATION AND/OR THE DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE REPTILE THEORY | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE UNDISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOHN CAMBOU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS 1-8 AND MEET AND CONFER ATTEMPT | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO, 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL CONDITION, WEALTH, OR SIZE | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S INSURANCE | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MILLENNIUM SHOES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO EXCLLIDE EVIDENCE OF ANY LOSS OF PAST OR FUTURE EARNINGS | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOHN CAMBOU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTON/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Millennium Shoes, Inc (Defendant) |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Betty Blea (Plaintiff) |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) |