Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALICIA OLIVA VS FIDENCIO PABLO RUIZ ET AL
On April 10, 2015 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 10, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Jury Verdict
Case Duration
4 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Alicia Oliva (Plaintiff) |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES 1) MOTOR VEHICLE Negligence; ETC | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Alicia Oliva (Plaintiff) |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons |