Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DANIEL ARONOW VS CHRYSLER GROUP LLC
On December 10, 2014 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2014
Last Refreshed
August 27, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year and 24 days
Time To Trial
2 years, 5 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Jury Trial |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Final Status Conference |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) - |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING FROM ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL HEARING | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) - |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Status Conference - Held |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF OUTCOME OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Trial Date Set) - |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF OUTCOME OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ORDER | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ORDER | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2016 | NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERAHON OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | ||
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERAHON OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Judge |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Held |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDER OF MAY 26, 2016 IS GRANTED. | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Clerk |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ARMIG KHODANIAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; ETC | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | FCA US LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL DEVLIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 26, 2016 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | RULINGS/ORDERS | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Judge |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 (Court Review; Denied) - |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REPLY SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SMOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET OUNE | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief-Supplemental Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE/OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT FCA US LLC ' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 (Motion to Compel; Submitted-On Briefs) - |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Clerk |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 (Motion to Compel; Matter continued) - |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff); Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT CHRYSLER GROUP, LLC AND PLAINTIFF DANIEL ARONOW WITH RESPECT TO ONGOING DISCOVERY DISPUTE | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Judge |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | RULINGS/ORDERS | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Clerk |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ETC. | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MATTHEW PROUDFOOT SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, ETC. | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | FCA US LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MATTHEW M. PROUDFOOT IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | FCA US LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE TN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | FCA US LLC'S, FORMERLY KNOWN AS CHRYSLER GROUP LLC, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Off Calendar) - |
|
January 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Court Order - Held |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON FCA'S PETITION FOR COORDINATION [JCCP 4842] | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND FOR PROSPECTIVE MONETARY SANCTIONS | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND FOR PROSPECTIVE MONETARY SANCTIONS | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL DEVLIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Chrysler Group, LLC (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Daniel Aronow (Plaintiff) |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS |