Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO VS CHERRON CLOY ET AL
On August 19, 2014 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ - Return | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST) Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST) Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE SUMMARY | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CARRIER SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO GCP 585 IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT/BY COURT | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/COURT JUDGMENT | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF INSURED SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO CCP 585 IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FIRM TELEPHONE AND FACSIMILE CHANGE | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF HARLAN M. REESE) ESQ. SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARAH KLEIN IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF VENUE | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by State Farm Mutual Autombile Ins. Co. (Plaintiff) |
|