Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ANTHONY MOORE VS SAN GABRIEL TRANSIT INC ET AL
On November 30, 2010 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Soussan G. Bruguera presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Anthony Moore (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 71 (Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 71 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Proceeding continued) - |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Agreement (Full)) - |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement-Agreement (Full) Filed by Mediator |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE. AND ORDER | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 71 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS-COMPLAINT | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
General Denial Filed by Joseph, II Hernandez (Defendant); Anita Hernandez (Defendant); Joseph C. Hernandez (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
General Denial Filed by Joseph, II Hernandez (Defendant); Anita Hernandez (Defendant); Joseph C. Hernandez (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Anthony Moore (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS GIVES NOTICE OF RULING | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 71 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Proceeding continued) - |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by San Gabriel Transit Inc (Legacy Party) |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by San Gabriel Transit Inc (Legacy Party) |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINTPERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by San Gabriel Transit Inc (Legacy Party); Galdian Ashot (Legacy Party) |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by San Gabriel Transit Inc (Legacy Party); Galdian Ashot (Legacy Party) |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 71 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Proceeding continued) - |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Anthony Moore (Plaintiff) |
|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Anthony Moore (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Anthony Moore (Plaintiff) |