Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
YVETTE INDONESIA KAKISH VS MERCEDES BENZ USA LLC ET AL
On November 30, 2010 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michael C. Solner presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 39 (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) - |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 39 Court Order (Court Order; OSC Discharged) - |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Yvette Indonesia Kakish (Plaintiff) |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 39 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) - |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC (Defendant); Keyes European, LLC (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Yvette Indonesia Kakish (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 39 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) - |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC (Defendant); Keyes European, LLC (Defendant) |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFFNDANTS MFRCEDES-BENZ USA, LIC AND KEYES MOTORS, JNC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: L. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE SONG BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT.; ETC. | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Yvette Indonesia Kakish (Plaintiff) |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |