Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FOREVER 21 INC VS SPICY GIRL INC ET AL
On November 30, 2010 a breach contrct/warnty (sellr pltf) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Torrance Courthouse
Category
Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 29 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment (returned to atty svc ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment (returned to atty svc ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract - misc Issued (REJECTED-Abstract of Judgment WAS NOT SIGNED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB LEGAL SUPPORT ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract - misc Issued (REJECTED-Abstract of Judgment WAS NOT SIGNED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB LEGAL SUPPORT ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment (REJECTED: ATTY AND ATTYS ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH, JUDGMENT DATE INCORRET, CORRECT DEBTORS NAME RETURNED TO ATTY SVC ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment (REJECTED: ATTY AND ATTYS ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH, JUDGMENT DATE INCORRET, CORRECT DEBTORS NAME RETURNED TO ATTY SVC ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal (OF DEFENANT OXFORD CIRCUS FASHIONSINC.) - Case Dismissed/Disposed OSC RE Dismissal (OF DEFENANT OXFORD CIRCUS FASHIONSINC.) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal (OF DEFENANT OXFORD CIRCUS FASHIONSINC.) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (DFLT PKG TO LCLK ) - Completed OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (DFLT PKG TO LCLK 4/24/12) - Completed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (DFLT PKG TO LCLK 4/24/12) - Completed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Continued by Court) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Continued by Court) - |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Continued by Court OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Continued by Court Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Continued by Court Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Continued by Court) - |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF DELMAS WOODS AND JRYY NOH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (MEMO OF P&A ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DELMAS A. WOODS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment ($100,429.73 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (DOES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JERRY NOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, DECLARATION OF DELMAS A. WOODS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DELMAS A. WOODS REGARDING CALCULATION OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (DOES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (MEMO OF P&A ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment ($100,429.73 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF DELMAS WOODS AND JRYY NOH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (OSC RE: FT FILE DEFAULT JUDG. PACK) - Submitted OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (OSC RE: FT FILE DEFAULT JUDG. PACK) - Submitted Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (OSC RE: FT FILE DEFAULT JUDG. PACK) - Submitted Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (OSC RE: FT FILE DEFAULT JUDG. PACK) - Matter continued OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (OSC RE: FT FILE DEFAULT JUDG. PACK) - Matter continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (OSC RE: FT FILE DEFAULT JUDG. PACK) - Matter continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (C/F ) - Matter continued OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (C/F 10/25/11) - Matter continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg (C/F 10/25/11) - Matter continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Completed OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Completed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Completed Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) - (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) - |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Off Calendar Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Off Calendar Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Off Calendar Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) - |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (as to Spicy Girl Fashions, Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (as to Spicy Girl Fashions, Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR SPICY- #5.13.17.30. DATE OF MAILING ITEM 6B CANNOT BE DATED BEFORE REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ITEM 3. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMP | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR SPICY- #5.13.17.30. DATE OF MAILING ITEM 6B CANNOT BE DATED BEFORE REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ITEM 3. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR SPICY- #5 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICF OF FIRST AMENDED Summons AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR SPICY- #5 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC., OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIREST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR SPICY GIRL- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON . NO SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR SPICY GIRL- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON 1/5/11. NO SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (OSC RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC. OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Order to Show Cause (OSC RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC. OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Order to Show Cause (OSC RE FILING DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTSPICY GIRL INC. OR FILING ANANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) - Held-Continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Matter continued OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Matter continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Matter continued Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons O FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) - |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Continued by Court Conference-Case Management - Continued by Court Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) - |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Continued by Court Judge: Ramona G. See |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS /INCORRECT NAME) | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS /INCORRECT NAME) | |
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (as to Spicy Girl Inc., a Californ. Corporation ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (as to Spicy Girl Inc., a Californ. Corporation ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (AS OXFORD CIRCUS FASHIONS INC., A CALIF CORP ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (AS OXFORD CIRCUS FASHIONS INC., A CALIF CORP ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (as to Oxford Circus Fasions, Inc. reject-#5 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (as to Spicy Girl, Inc. reject-#5 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (as to Spicy Girl, Inc. reject-#5 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (as to Oxford Circus Fasions, Inc. reject-#5 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICFI OF Summons ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Summons 1st amended complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Summons 1st amended complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: L BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. IMPLIED INDEMNIFICATION 3. COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF 5. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY 6. NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION 7. INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed ( *FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed ( *FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: I. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC. | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: I. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC. | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Forever 21 Inc. (Plaintiff) |