Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS LLC VS JI HYUN KWON
On November 30, 2010 an other commercial/business tort (not fraud/ breach of contract) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Commercial/Business Tort (not fraud/ breach of contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
10 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) - |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event | ROIICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) - |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Ji Hyun Kwon (Defendant) |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Agreement (Full)) - |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement-Agreement (Full) Filed by Mediator |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT FIRST | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Vacated) - |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLIANCE DFAI)LINE | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | PARTIES STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF MEDIATION COMPLIANCE DEADLINE | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS, LLC AND FAUSTO MENDEZ, JRS ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWONS FIRST AMENDED Cross-Complaint | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Court Order - Held |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; WITH ATTACHMENT | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer; Vacated) - |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer; Continued by Plaintiff) - |
|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-DEFFNDANTS ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS, LLCS, FAUSTO MENDEZ, JRS., AND HALA GROVIERS REPLY TO CROSSCOMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO Demurrer TO FIRST AMENDED Cross-Complaint | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWONS OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS Demurrer TO FIRST AMENDED Cross-Complaint | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Ji Hyun Kwon (Defendant) |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON Demurrer BY PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS, LLC AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS FAUSTO MENDEZ, JR., AND HALA GROVIER TO FIRST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWON | |
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF Demurrer AND Demurrer BY PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS, LLC AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS FAUSTO MENDEZ, JR., AND HALA GROVIER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSSCOMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWON; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWONS FIRST AMENIWI) Cross-Complaint AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT I) FAILURE TO PAY WAGES (LC 2OI, 202, 218), ETC | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by Ji Hyun Kwon (Defendant) |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE Demurrer | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-DEFENDANTS ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS, LLC, FAUSTO MENDEZ, JR., AND HALA GROIERS REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO CROSS- DEFENDANTS Demurrer TO Cross-Complaint | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWONS OPPOSITION TO CROSSDEFENDANTS Demurrer TO Cross-Complaint | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Ji Hyun Kwon (Defendant) |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF Demurrer AND Demurrer BY PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS, LLC AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS FAUSTO MENDEZ, JR., AND HALA GROVIER TO Cross-Complaint OF DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWON; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITI | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging OF OUT-OFJURISDICTION AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF Demurrer TO CROSS- COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JI HVUN KWON | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Cross-Complainant |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff); Ama Laboratory (Legacy Party) |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 1 (Order ReReassignment of Case; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Ji Hyun Kwon (Defendant) |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT JI HYUN KWONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ADVANCED MEDICAL ANALYSIS, LLCS COMPLAINT | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Ji Hyun Kwon (Defendant) |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons Cross-Complaint | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JI HYUN KWONS Cross-Complaint AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT 1) FAILURE TO PAY WAGES (LC 201, 202, 218) 2) WAITING TIME WAGE CONTINUATION (LC 203) 3) VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 226 4) VIOLATION OF BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200 | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Ji Hyun Kwon (Defendant) |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMPLAINT | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | PEREMPTORY CHALLENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVJL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6 | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEM ENT CONFFRENCE | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Advanced Medical Analysis, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) Misappropriation of Trade Secrets; ETC. |