Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VLADIMIR NESTERENKO VS WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
On November 30, 2010 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Nesterenko Vladimir, represented by Latter Daniel S. Esq., against Wells Fargo Bank National Association, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge John Shepard Wiley Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 5 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Vladimir Nesterenko (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Vladimir Nesterenko (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMMWS FOR: I. BREACH OFVARRANTV ICOM. C 44011; | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Vladimir Nesterenko (Plaintiff) |