Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
xxxxxxxxxxxxxx VS O'NEIL DATA SYSTEMS INC
On November 30, 2010 an other employment complaint case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Rex Heeseman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 25 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 5 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Jury Trial |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Final Status Conference |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes order) - |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement OF ENTIRE CASE | |
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Appearance) - |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by O'neil Data Systems, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ONEIL DATA SYSTEMS INC. TO COMPLAINT | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by O'neil Data Systems, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR LAWS AND INDUSTRIAL WELFARE COMMISSION ORDERS: SEEKING WAGES PENALTIES INTEREST `1HERION AND VIOLATION OF B&PC SECTION 17200 AND ATTORNEYS FEES REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |