Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JEANDELLE SINCLAIR VS NOELIA RODRIGUEZ
On November 19, 2010 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 months and 1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Jeandelle Sinclair (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 57 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 1 (Order ReReassignment of Case; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 57 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) - |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 57 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6) | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Noelia Rodriguez (Defendant) |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Jeandelle Sinclair (Plaintiff) |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Jeandelle Sinclair (Plaintiff) |