Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD VS COLONY INSURA
On November 19, 2010 an insurance coverage (not complex) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Insurance Coverage (not complex) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hart- (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hart- (Plaintiff) |
|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OFF-CALENDAR AND OSC RE DISMISSAL | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hart- (Plaintiff) |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement OF ENTIRE CASE | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Colony Insurance Company (Defendant) |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hart- (Plaintiff) |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hart- (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COIIPLAINT FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR EQUITABLE CONTRIBUT1ON; ETC |