Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STEPHEN TALBERT VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL
On November 19, 2010 a writ - mandamus on limited court case matter (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Writ - Mandamus on Limited Court Case Matter (General Jurisdiction)
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year and 13 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (MOTION-JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Vacated) - |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 (Motion to Compel; Off Calendar) - |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURTS ORDER ON CITY OF LOS ANGELES EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF ANIMAL SERVICES NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Department of Animal Services (Defendant) |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant) |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CASEY CHON IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF LOS ANGELES' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CITY OF LOS ANGELES EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; ETC | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CITY OF LOS ANGELES Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF ITS Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; AND DECLARATION OF CASEY CHON IN SUPPORT | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COURTS ORDER | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant); Department of Animal Services (Defendant) |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) - |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF Summons AND COMPLAINT FOR DEFECTIVE SERVICE ON ROBERT PEREZ; ETC | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant) |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant) |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER BY DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF ANIMAL SERVICES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 85 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Proof of Service Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHARLOTTE SPADARO | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6) | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF; DECLARATION OF EX PARTE NOTICE; PROPOSED COURT ORDER | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 86 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 85 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER TCODE CIV, PROC., 170.6) | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND Petition for Writ of Mandate | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Stephen Talbert (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAEMNG ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND PRELIM [NARY INJUNCIIOJ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND ATILHORITLES; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF; DECLARATION OF EX PARTE NOTICE; PROPOSED COURT ORDER |