Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MALIVAN KENEMIXAY VS ALDO U S INC
On November 19, 2010 an other employment complaint case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 13, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Emilie H. Elias;Category
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Outcome Type
LEGACY-UNKNOWN DISPOSITION AT CONVERSION
Status
Unknown
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 8 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Transfer Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Transfer Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CAL WORN IA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. NOTICE OF TRANSFER | |
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Transfer Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-06-28 00:00:00 | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING AT JUNE 11, 2012 STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IN JCCP NO. 4581 -ALDO US WAGE AND HOUR CASES | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner: 556 Days | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-05-07 00:00:00 | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
May 07, 2012 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
|
April 03, 2012 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon | |
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-04-03 00:00:00 | |
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR COORIMNATION OF ADD-ON CASE | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF Supplemental Declaration OF DOMINIC J. MESSIIIA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE; KENEMIXAY V. ALDO | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF DELIVERY OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INCS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE: KENEMIXAY V. ALDO, BY DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC. | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INCS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE; KENEMIXAY V. ALDO | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF DELIVERY OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INCS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE: KENEMIXAY V. ALDO, BY DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC. | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 24, 2012 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-01-24 00:00:00 | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Aldo U.S., Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Aldo U.S., Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE DEFENDANT ALDO U.S1, INC.S Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Aldo U.S., Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFF MALIVAN KENEMIXAYS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INCS Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF V PLAINTIFF MALI VAN KENEMIXAYS NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INCS Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETITION TO COORDINATE ADDON CASE | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF DELIEVERY OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE BY DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC. | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF DELIEVERY OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE BY DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC. | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-12-02 00:00:00 | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
December 02, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-09-30 00:00:00 | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
September 30, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ALDO US, INC.'S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S Petition for Coordination OF ADD-ON CASE | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COFIPLAINT & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) VIOLATION OLCALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 510 AND 1198 (UNPAID OVERTIME); (2) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Second Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Second Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-07-08 00:00:00 | |
July 08, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 11, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-11 00:00:00 | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-03-07 00:00:00 | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWEI OF DEFENDANT ALDO U.S., INC., TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MALI VAN KENEMIXAY FOR: (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 510 AND 1 198 (UNPAID OVERTIME); (2) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 1194, 1197 AID 1197.1 (UNPAID MINIMUM WAGE | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION & ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ. | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Malivan Knenmixay (Plaintiff) Filed by Malivan Knenmixay (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Malivan Knenmixay (Plaintiff) |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-12-07 00:00:00 | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Order EMILIE H\. ELIAS 8:30 am | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 324 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 07, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 324 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Other Employment Complaint | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Malivan Knenmixay (Plaintiff) Filed by Malivan Knenmixay (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCE[1ENT UNDFR THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 269 ET SEQ. (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFHRNIA LABOR CODC 510 AND 1198 (UNPAID OVERINIE); ETC. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Malivan Knenmixay (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & ENFORCE[1ENT UNDFR THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 269 ET SEQ. (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFHRNIA LABOR CODC 510 AND 1198 (UNPAID OVERINIE); ETC. |