Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TRM MANUFACTURING INC VS TECHART FOODS INC ET AL
On November 17, 2010 a contract/warranty breach - seller plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Rita Miller presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 17, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 02, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Joseph R. Kalin;Category
Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Legacy Judgment
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 21 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOHN CHINO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TRM MANUFACTURING, INC.S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED AGAINST TECHART FOODS, INC., MR. PALLET WRAP, MILPAS DISTRIBUTING, INC., AND MICHAEL SHUMAN | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Court | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Other Judgment 508 Days | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY LAWRENCE N. HALPERIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TRM MANUFACTURING, INC.S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Court |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-03-12 00:00:00 | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 (Order to Show Cause; Court makes order) - (Order to Show Cause; Court makes order) - |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Joseph R\. Kalin 8:45 am | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 (Order to Show Cause; Court makes order) - |
|
January 11, 2012 | hearing | Calendaring:Order to Show Cause Rita Miller | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court makes order) - Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court makes order) - |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter Rita Miller | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-01-11 00:00:00 | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court makes order) - |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-12-14 00:00:00 | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Rita Miller 8:45 am | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Unknown Event Type |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Non-Appearance (Case Review) Rita Miller | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Matter continued) - Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Matter continued) - |
|
November 16, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Order to Show Cause Rita Miller | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-11-16 00:00:00 | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE N. HALPERIN REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE PROVE UP PAPERS ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Matter continued) - |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-11-01 00:00:00 | |
November 01, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Non-Appearance (Case Review) Rita Miller | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Rita Miller 9:30 am | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Final Status Conference Final Status Conference |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Rita Miller 9:00 am | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Final Status Conference |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Further Proceedings Rita Miller | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 (Further Proceedings; Court makes order) - (Further Proceedings; Court makes order) - |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-10-18 00:00:00 | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 (Further Proceedings; Court makes order) - |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Further Proceedings Rita Miller | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 (Further Proceedings; Court makes order) - (Further Proceedings; Court makes order) - |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: OSC RE: WHY ANSWER OF MILPAS AND MR. PALLET WRAP SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 (Further Proceedings; Court makes order) - |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Rita Miller 8:45 am | |
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-10-04 00:00:00 | |
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. ALTAGEN TN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REPRESENTATION OF DEFENDANT CORPORATIONS | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING REPRESENTATION OF DEFENDANT CORPORATIONS | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 13, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Order to Show Cause Rita Miller | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Post Mediation Status Rita Miller 8:45 am | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-09-13 00:00:00 | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TRM MANUFACTURING, INC.S REPORT TO COURT AFTER SCHEDULED MEDIATION DEADLINE | |
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Rita Miller | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 17, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Post Mediation Status Rita Miller | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Rita Miller 8:45 am | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-03-17 00:00:00 | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 10, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Rita Miller | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Amended Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANT TECHART FOODS INC., RE Summons, COMPLAINT AND Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS Answer to Complaint | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Mr. Pallet Wrap (Defendant); Milpas Distributing, Inc. (Defendant); Michael Shuman (Defendant) Filed by Mr. Pallet Wrap (Defendant); Milpas Distributing, Inc. (Defendant); Michael Shuman (Defendant) |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Mr. Pallet Wrap (Defendant); Milpas Distributing, Inc. (Defendant); Michael Shuman (Defendant) |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS TECHART FOODS INC., MR. PALLET WRAP, MILPAS DISTRIBUTING, INC., AND MICHAEL SHUMAN RE Summons, COMPLAINT AND Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TRM MANUFACTURING, INC.S COMPLAINT FOR: I) ACCOT NT STATED 2) BREACH OF CONTRACT. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TRM MANUFACTURING, INC.S COMPLAINT FOR: I) ACCOT NT STATED 2) BREACH OF CONTRACT. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by TRM Manufacturing, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |