Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS PMG PARKING MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC ET A
On November 15, 2010 an other complaint (non-tort/non-complex) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Barbara A. Meiers presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 15, 2010
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Complaint (non-tort/non-complex) (General Jurisdiction)
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
11 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 12 Status Conference (Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 12 Court Order - Held |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff) |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 12 Status Conference (Status Conference; Continued by Court) - |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons & COMPLAINT | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR MONEY I)UF ON UNPAID PARKING OCCUPANCY LAX ASSESSMKNTS | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff) |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |