Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DENISE GARCIA VS TRITON ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ET AL
On November 12, 2010 an other commercial/business tort (not fraud/ breach of contract) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 12, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Commercial/Business Tort (not fraud/ breach of contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL Motion to Strike COMPLAINT; ETC | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. SIMONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSIT1ON TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL Motion to Strike COMPLAINT, ETC | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Points and Authorities Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND MOTION OF HEARING FOR SPECIAL Motion to Strike COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATING THE Fair Debt Collection Practices Act; 2. VIOLATION OF B&P 17200; AND 3. INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND SUPPORTING Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DECL1FARION OF WARREN LAROSE I1 SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL Motion to Strike COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16 | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Triton Acceptance Corporation (Defendant); Warren Larose (Defendant); Steven Sherman (Defendant) et al. |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint OF DENISE GARCIA | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DILIGENCI | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof-Service/Summons | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Denise Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Denise Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR 1) VIOLATING THE Fair Debt Collection Practices ActON; 2) VIOLATION OF B&P 17200; AND 3) INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |