Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
xxxxx xxxxxxxxxx VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC
On November 05, 2010 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Xxxxxxxxxx Xxxxx, against Bmw Of North America Llc, represented by Lehrman Kate S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Jury Verdict
Case Duration
9 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 64 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event | BMW OF NORTII AMERICA, LLCS ANS4ER RO COMILAINT; I)EMANI) FOR JURY TRIAL | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant) |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by xxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |