Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AMAL GIRGIS VS DADSON WASHER SERVICE INC
On November 05, 2010 a declaratory relief only (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Girgis Amal, against Dadson Washer Service Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction)
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-26 00:00:00 | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 175 Days | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
March 23, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-03-23 00:00:00 | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 14, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC RE Dismissal Gregory W. Alarcon | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-02-14 00:00:00 | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 16, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Declaratory Relief Only | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Amal Girgis (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Amal Girgis (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Amal Girgis (Plaintiff) |