Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DEBORAH HARTNETT VS SPIERER WOODWARD CORBALIS & GOLDBERG
On May 13, 2010 a legal malpractice (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 13, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 11, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Legal Malpractice (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Malpractice
Case Outcome Type
Jury Verdict
Status
Trial Verdict
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 24 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal Filed by: Clerk | |
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL | |
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.) Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL | |
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal Filed by: Clerk | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.) Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.) Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Appellant | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Appellant Filed by Appellant |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Appellant | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Appellant |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for New Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 8:30 am | |
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Hearing on Motion for New Trial - Held - Taken under Submission Hearing on Motion for New Trial - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-09-06 00:00:00 | |
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Hearing on Motion for New Trial - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion for New Trial; Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADDITUR, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE Motion for New Trial; Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for New Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S Motion for New Trial; Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S Motion for New Trial | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Memorandum of Points and Authorities RE: MOTION FOR ADD1TUR OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE Motion for New Trial | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AND SERVE Memorandum of Points and Authorities FOR ADDITUR OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A Motion for New Trial RE: DAMAGES | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Clerk | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING OF Motion for New Trial | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed by Clerk |
|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 08, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for New Trial Robert H\. O'Brien | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Clerk | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING OF Motion for New Trial | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed by Clerk |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT RE: DEFNDANTS SPIERER, WOODWARD, CORBALIS & GOLDBERG, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMO COSTS SUMMARY | |
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Verdict Filed by: Clerk | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-07-07 00:00:00 | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 8:30 am | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) - |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
General Verdict Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | SPECIAL VERDICT | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Verdict 420 Days | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) - |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
General Verdict Filed by Clerk |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 8:30 am | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-07-06 00:00:00 | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Clerk | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Jury Deliberating) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Jury Deliberating) - |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Jury Deliberating) - |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Clerk |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-07-05 00:00:00 | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 8:30 am | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
July 05, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | SPECIAL Jury Instructions REQUESTED BY DEFENDANT | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] PLAINTIFF SPECIAL Jury Instructions | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] PLAINTIFF SPECIAL Jury Instructions | |
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-07-01 00:00:00 | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 8:30 am | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-29 00:00:00 | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 8:30 am | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-28 00:00:00 | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 1:30 pm | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Half Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Half Day of Trial Held) - |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Half Day of Trial Held) - |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-24 00:00:00 | |
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 8:31 am | |
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
June 21, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Susan Bryant-Deason | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-21 00:00:00 | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert H\. O'Brien 10:15 am | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Transferred for Trial) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Transferred for Trial) - |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Transferred for Trial) - |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-20 00:00:00 | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-15 00:00:00 | |
June 15, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Susan Bryant-Deason | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion Hearing Susan Bryant-Deason 8:29 am | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-14 00:00:00 | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 (Motion Hearing; Matter continued) - (Motion Hearing; Matter continued) - |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 (Motion Hearing; Matter continued) - |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S Motion in Limine REGARDING EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS FUTURE DAMAGES INVOLVING FUTURE FINACTNG, AS SPSCULARIVE AND UNCERTAIN; ETC. | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S Motion in Limine REGARDING EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS FUTURE DAMAGES INVOLVING FUTURE FINACTNG, AS SPSCULARIVE AND UNCERTAIN; ETC. | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion in Limine REGARDING EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS FUTURE DAMAGES INVOLVING FUTURE FINANCING, AS SPECULATIVE AND UNCERTAIN; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR., ESQ. | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion in Limine REGARDING EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS FUTURE DAMAGES INVOLVING FUTURE FINANCING, AS SPECULATIVE AND UNCERTAIN; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR., ESQ. | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S Motion in Limine REGARDING EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS FUTURE DAMAGES INVOLVING FUTURE FINANCING AS SPECULATIVE AND UNCERTAIN | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-25 00:00:00 | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - |
|
May 25, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion Hearing Susan Bryant-Deason | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-16 00:00:00 | |
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-13 00:00:00 | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Final Status Conference - Held Final Status Conference - Held |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] DEFENDANT'S AMENDED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] DEFENDANT'S AMENDED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Final Status Conference - Held |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ex Parte Motion Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-10 00:00:00 | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Motion; Denied) - Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Motion; Denied) - |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ANNA BROWNE RE NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT LATE DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES (CC.P. 2034.710) | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT LATE DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES (C.C.P. S2034. 710) | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO Ex Parte Application FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO SERVE LATE DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESSES; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR., ESQ. | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ANNA BROWNE RE NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT LATE DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES (CC.P. 2034.710) | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT LATE DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES (C.C.P. S2034. 710) | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO Ex Parte Application FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO SERVE LATE DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESSES; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR., ESQ. | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Motion; Denied) - |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-09 00:00:00 | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Order Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Court Order - Held Court Order - Held |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Court Order - Held |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | IPROPOSEDJ JOINT Jury Instructions [CACI] | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | IPROPOSEDI JOINT TRIAL WITNESS LIST | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE [BY PLAINTIFF] | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE [BY PLAINTIFF] | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | IPROPOSEDJ JOINT Jury Instructions [CACI] | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | [PROPOSED] JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
May 04, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Mandatory Settlement Conference Edward A\. Ferns | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-04-29 00:00:00 | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion Hearing Susan Bryant-Deason 8:29 am | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. S2034300 | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-04-20 00:00:00 | |
April 20, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion Hearing Susan Bryant-Deason | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Leave Susan Bryant-Deason 8:29 am | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DOE 1 FOR THE TRUE NAME OF THE DEFENDANT TO BE STEVEN SPIERER, ESQ.; ETC. | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application FOR MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS LATE DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESSES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2034.260 AND 2034.300 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ORDER FOR SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING THEREON; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DOE 1 FOR THE TRUE NAME OF THE DEFENDANT TO BE STEVEN SPIERER, ESQ.; ETC. | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-03-28 00:00:00 | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS PROFITS AND FINANCIAL CONDITION; DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, TR., FJSQ. | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Denied) - Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Denied) - |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for an Order Susan Bryant-Deason 8:29 am | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Denied) - |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS PROFITS AND FINANCIAL CONDITION; DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, TR., FJSQ. | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS PROFITS AND FINANCIAL CONDITION | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAVID F. BROWN | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
March 24, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for an Order Susan Bryant-Deason | |
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Exparte proceeding Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-03-23 00:00:00 | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT O PLAINTIFFS Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO DISCOVER DEFENDANTS PROFITS AND FINANCIAL CONDITION | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS PROFITS AND FINANCIAL CONDITION; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION I | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS PROFITS AND FINANCIAL CONDITION PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 3295(C) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ORDER FOR SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING THEREON; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF GEO | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR., ESQ. | |
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR., ESQ. | |
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
February 25, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Leave Susan Bryant-Deason | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Post Mediation Status Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-01-28 00:00:00 | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Post Mediation Status Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-01-26 00:00:00 | |
January 26, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Post Mediation Status Susan Bryant-Deason | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) - Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) - |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) - |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Special Status End:Sent-Mediation-$50,001-100,000 | |
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Closed-ADR ADR Neutral 8:00 am | |
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Non-Agreement) - (Closed-ADR; Non-Agreement) - |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Non-Agreement) - |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by: Mediator | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator Filed by Mediator |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by: ADR Clerk CADR | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Special Status Start:Sent-Mediation-$50,001-100,000 | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
September 15, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Susan Bryant-Deason | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-09-15 00:00:00 | |
September 15, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Post Mediation Status Susan Bryant-Deason | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Clerk | |
September 15, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Final Status Conference Susan Bryant-Deason | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held |
|
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Filed by Clerk |
|
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND -RUR--- ORDER THEREON | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 18, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Susan Bryant-Deason | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-08-13 00:00:00 | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Initial Status Conference Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Initial Status Conference - Held Initial Status Conference - Held |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Initial Status Conference - Held |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT SPIERER, WOODWARD, CORBALIS & GOLDBERG, APCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF DEBORAN HARTNETT S COMPLAINT | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Spierer, Woodward, Corbalis & Goldberg (Defendant) |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-07-27 00:00:00 | |
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) - Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) - |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) - |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF IMTIAL STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-07-08 00:00:00 | |
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Initial Status Conference Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
July 08, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Initial Status Conference Susan Bryant-Deason | |
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Matter continued) - Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER | |
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk | |
June 15, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Initial Status Conference Susan Bryant-Deason | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMPLAINT | |
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Legal Malpractice | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC. | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Deborah Hartnett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC. |