Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BRONCO THOMAS VS RAYMOND ANTHONY GARNETT
On February 11, 2010 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Thomas Bronco, against Garnett Raymond Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 11, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 month and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Bronco Thomas (Plaintiff) |