Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HAKOP J SAPUNJIAN VS MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC ET AL
On December 02, 2009 an othr breach contr/warr-not fraud (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Rita Miller presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed - Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR (8/12/10PHYLLIS G. POLLACK, MEDIATOR) - Agreement (Full) Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 16, Rita Miller, Presiding Conference-Post Mediation Status - Matter is heard, matter continued Judge: Rita Miller |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement ("UNCONDITIONAL" ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement-Agreement (Full) (SUPPL SANA FILED: MEDIATION ENDED IN FULL AGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk |
|
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT FILED MEDIATION HAS NOT ENDED ) Filed by Mediator |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Mediation Hrg Date Filed by Mediator |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 16, Rita Miller, Presiding Conference-Case Management (/OSC) - Trial Date Set Judge: Rita Miller |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint (MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC AND CALSTAR MOTORS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |