Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE VS PANENO PARTNERSHIP ET AL
On December 28, 2006 an eminent domain/condemnation (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Bruce Mitchell presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 28, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Eminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Eminent Domain
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 1 day
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 44, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Final Distribution of Funds on Deposit with the Court) Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order (GRANTING PLAINTIFF CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE'S APPLICATION FOR WIRTHDRAWAL OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN EXCESS OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION) Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application (FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN EXCVESS OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION) Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Re Final Distri...) of 11/05/2018) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 1, Debre Katz Weintraub, Presiding Court Order Judge: Debre Katz Weintraub |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Re Final Distri...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VACATING OF FIRST PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Court Order - Held |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FIRST PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FIRST PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION BY Eminent Domain | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSIT | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ACCEPT DEPOSIT | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR POSSESSION | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION; ETC. | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF Bruce Mitchell, COURT COMMISSIONER; ETC. | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department 59 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by City of La Canada Flintridge (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF APPRAISAL |