Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BARBARA ANN BATSON VS LANA S WORTZ
On December 28, 2006 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 28, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
LEGACY DISPOSITION TYPE
Status
Transfer
Case Duration
9 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Outgoing Transfer Filed by Clerk |
|
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Lana S. Wortz (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Lana S. Wortz (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Lana S. Wortz (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
September 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
September 18, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held |
|
August 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Non-Agreement) - |
|
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held |
|
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT | |
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator |
|
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Mediator |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Mediation Hearing Date Filed by Mediator |
|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Lana S. Wortz (Defendant) |
|
May 02, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
May 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Barbara Ann Batson (Plaintiff) |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Barbara Ann Batson (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Unknown Event Type |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Lana S. Wortz (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Lana S. Wortz (Defendant) |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Barbara Ann Batson (Plaintiff) |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons | |
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Barbara Ann Batson (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Barbara Ann Batson (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons |