Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ELLIS SMITH ET AL VS CARL WHALEY ET AL
On December 18, 2006 an other contract dispute (not breach/insurance/fraud/negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer
Category
Other Contract Dispute (not breach/insurance/fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
General Insurance
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 72 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ellis Smith (Plaintiff); Leotis Coleman (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Filed by Clerk |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 72 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) - |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ellis Smith (Plaintiff); Leotis Coleman (Plaintiff) |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION CCP SECTION 409 |