Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JDH PACIFIC INC VS PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION
On December 18, 2006 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Jdh Pacific Inc., against Parker-Hannifin Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 30 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Unknown Event Type |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC. | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by JDH Pacific, Inc. (Plaintiff) |