Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BRANDON WILLIAMS VS ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP
On December 05, 2006 an other personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Brandon Williams (Plaintiff) |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Vacated) - |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Court Order - Held |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER PERMITTING TIG INSURANCE ADJUSTER TO APPEAR, ETC. | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER PERMITTING INSURANCE ADJUSTER TO APPEAR, ETC. | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of Facts Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SCOTT DELINE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BERNARD'S BROTHERS Motion for Summary Judgment | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED FACTS | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO BERNARD'S BROTHERS' Motion for Summary Judgment; ETC. | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY R. MCCORMICK IN SUPPORT OF GONSALVES, ETC. Motion for Summary Judgment | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement of Facts Filed by Gonsalves & Santucci, Inc. (Defendant); Conco Pumping (Legacy Party) |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Gonsalves & Santucci, Inc. (Defendant); Conco Pumping (Legacy Party) |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF GONSALVES &, ETC. Motion for Summary Judgment | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION & Motion for Summary Judgment OF DEFENDANT GONSALVES, ETC. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; ETC. | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Gonsalves & Santucci, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MIKE STEMASEK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S Motion for Summary Judgment | |
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement of Facts Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT BERNARDS BROTHERS'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion for Summary Judgment AND Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF Motion for Summary Judgment | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING DATE, ETC. | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S Ex Parte Application TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON ITS MOTION, ETC. | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S Motion for Summary Judgment | |
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Gonsalves & Santucci, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S Motion for Summary Judgment | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Clerk |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S Motion for Summary Judgment, ETC. | |
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE | |
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Gonsalves & Santucci, Inc. (Defendant); Conco Pumping (Legacy Party) |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP'S Cross-Complaint | |
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO Cross-Complaint | |
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Cross-Complainant |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO Cross-Complaint | |
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY | |
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO Cross-Complaint OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT, BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION | |
July 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
July 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order-Fixing Brief Dates Filed by Clerk |
|
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Brandon Williams (Plaintiff) |
|
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Brandon Williams (Plaintiff) |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE | |
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Bernards Brothers Construction (Legacy Party) |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT | |
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event | CROSS DEFENDANT, BERNARDS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, ETC | |
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event | CROSS-DEFENDANT, CROSS-COMPLAINANT, BERNARDS BROTHERS' CONSTRUCTION'S Cross-Complaint FOR COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY, ETC | |
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT | |
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ON Cross-Complaint | |
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | AMENDED Answer to Complaint | |
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof-Service/Summons | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint FOR COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY, ETC. | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Roofing Supply Group (Defendant) |
|
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Brandon Williams (Plaintiff) |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 (OSC - No Return of Service; OSC Discharged) - |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
December 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 13, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Brandon Williams (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PERSONAL INJURIES; ETC. |