Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARY GENDLER VS. FERNANDO SEGRE
On September 20, 1994 a declaratory relief only (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Ernest George Williams presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 1994
Last Refreshed
February 26, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction)
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl.
Status
Default Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 1996 | Docket Event |
Abstract - misc Issued (ABST ISSUED ) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 17, 1996 | Docket Event |
Abstract - misc Issued (3 ABSTS ISSUED ) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 1996 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed by Plaintiff |
|
January 29, 1996 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
December 28, 1995 | hearing |
in Department 26, Ernest George Williams, Presiding Status Conference - Off Calendar Judge: Ernest George Williams |
|
August 14, 1995 | hearing |
in Department 26, Ernest George Williams, Presiding Court Trial - Short Cause - Trial Date Vacated Judge: Ernest George Williams |
|
July 07, 1995 | hearing |
in Department 26, Ernest George Williams, Presiding Motion Hearing - Granted Judge: Ernest George Williams |
|
February 09, 1995 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
December 09, 1994 | hearing |
in Department 26, Ernest George Williams, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Matter continued Judge: Ernest George Williams |
|
December 09, 1994 | hearing |
in Department 1, Murray Gross, Presiding Motion to Transfer - Motion Denied Judge: Murray Gross |
|
December 09, 1994 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Notice Of Association Of Counsel Steven G. Hoover Has Become Associated With Melvin L. Schecter As Attorney For Defendants Herein ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
October 04, 1994 | Docket Event |
in Department 1, Gary Klausner, Presiding Order Re: Reassignment of Case - Completed Judge: Gary Klausner |
|
September 28, 1994 | hearing |
in Department 31, Valerie Baker, Presiding Court Order - Completed Judge: Valerie Baker |
|
September 20, 1994 | Docket Event | Complaint |