Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
County of Alameda VS Garcia
On December 28, 2015 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Boydine A. Hall presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 28, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Parental Relationship/Obligations
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Other Parent-Child
Status
Other
Case Duration
5 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
June 16, 2016 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 06/16/2016 09:01 AM D- 508 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion re Child Support,.. Filed by Petitioner | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Governmental Complaint Filed for Rudy Garcia | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Rudy Anthony | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed |