Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Majied VS Majied
On August 13, 2014 a civil case was filed by Majied, Naeem, against Majied, Lilian, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Dawn B. Girard presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 13, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
4 years, 1 month and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Application Re: Restoration of Former Name Granted | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Application Re: Restoration of Former Name Filed | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Lilian Majied Granted | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Lilian Majied | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 303 date: 05/21/2015 time: 09:00 AM | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation and waiver of final declaration of disclosure Filed | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Naeem Majied | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations, and Waivers Filed | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 05/21/2015 09:00 AM D- 303 | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Order Issued | |
December 30, 2014 |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
Judge: Dawn B. Girard |
||
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 01/29/2015 09:00 AM D- 303 | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Initial Family Law Status Conference 12/30/2014 08:45 AM D- 303 | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Separate Property Declaration Filed | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent | |
October 20, 2014 |
Request for Hearing About Court Fee Waiver Order
Judge: Winifred Y. Smith |
||
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Fee Waiver Denied As To Naeem Majied | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte 10/20/2014 09:00 AM D- 1 | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing About Court Fee Waiver Order Filed for Naeem Majied | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Lilian Majied | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Lilian Majied Granted | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Lilian Majied | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Naeem Majied Denied | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Naeem Majied | |
September 15, 2014 |
Request for Hearing About Court Fee Waiver Order
Judge: Winifred Y. Smith |
||
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Fee Waiver Denied As To Naeem Majied | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Separate Property Declaration Filed | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Lilian Majied Filed | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Ex-Parte 09/15/2014 09:00 AM D- 1 | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing About Court Fee Waiver Order Filed for Naeem Majied | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Naeem Majied Denied | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Naeem Majied | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Initial Family Law Status Conference 12/30/2014 09:01 AM D- 302 | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed |