Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAMARENA-M
A Guardianship Of Person And Estate case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Randall J. Sherman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
GUARDIANSHIP OF PERSON AND ESTATE
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Consolidation
Case Duration
5 years, 8 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE CONSOLIDATED ON 08/21/2012. A246090 IS DESIGNATED THE LEAD CASE. | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT FOR 68 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS-PROBATE: MOTION, APPLICATION OR OTHER PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING AFTER THE FIRST PAPER; CERTAIN SUBSEQUENT PETITIONS, APPLICATIONS, OR OTHER OPPOSITION, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10162747 IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00 VOIDED DUE TO APPLIED TO WRONG CASE. | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED BY JANESICK, LINDA ON 09/09/2008 | |
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF .50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10186423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10010288. | |
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 08/08/2008 08:30:00 AM. | |
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE 8/8/08 | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/2008 AT 01:45:00 PM IN L72 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE 7/21/08 | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 68 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS-PROBATE: MOTION, APPLICATION OR OTHER PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING AFTER THE FIRST PAPER; CERTAIN SUBSEQUENT PETITIONS, APPLICATIONS, OR OTHER OPPOSITION IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10162747 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 187113. | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN L72 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN 07/21/2008 01:45:00 PM. | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP OR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY DRUAN JR, ANA ON 05/19/2008 | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 07/21/2008 AT 01:45:00 PM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN 04/28/2008 01:45:00 PM. | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN CONTINUED TO 07/21/2008 AT 01:45 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE 4/28/08 | |
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SOCIAL SERVICES COURT REPORT 4/22/08 | |
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE 4/22/08 | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN 03/03/2008 01:45:00 PM. | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2008 AT 01:45:00 PM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN CONTINUED TO 04/28/2008 AT 01:45 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2008 AT 13:45:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP OR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY DRUAN JR, ANA ON 03/03/2008 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. APPT GUARDIAN/SUCCESSOR GUARDIAN) FOR 12/17/2007 13:45:00 | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP OR CONSERVATORSHIP (LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 01/24/2008 | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OR CONSERVATOR (ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY GUARDIAN/CONSERVATOR) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 01/24/2008 | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN HEARD ON 12/17/2007 AT 13:45:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CONTINUED/OFF CALENDAR. | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT ENVELOPE) WAS FILED ON 12/06/2007 | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | INVESTIGATOR MEMORANDUM WAS FILED ON 12/06/2007 | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE-OTHER) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 12/05/2007 | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION (INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 11/28/2007 | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING (NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 11/28/2007 | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE-OTHER) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 11/28/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT ENVELOPE) WAS FILED ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) (DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR(S) (PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER PLACEHOLDER | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO ACT (CONSENT TO ACT) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM (CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DUTIES OF GUARDIAN (DUTIES OF GUARDIAN) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS (APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS (ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF CRT FEES & COSTS) WAS FILED BY ANA DRUAN JR ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/29/2007 |