Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KRIG-C
A Conservatorship Of Person And Estate case was filed by Gary N Krig, and Jason Green, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Caryl A. Lee presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Randall J. Sherman;Category
CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON AND ESTATE
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Case Duration
5 years, 8 months and 2 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIPT - OTHER FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/13/2012 | |
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/13/2012 | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER ON FINAL ACCOUNTING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 08/06/2012 | |
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER TERMINATING RECEIVED ON 08/03/2012. | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 08/02/2012 | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND FEES HAS BEEN GRANTED. | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND FEES FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED. | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 07/03/2012 09:00:00 AM. | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 06/27/2012 | |
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 06/01/2012 | |
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 06/01/2012 | |
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2012 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 05/29/2012 09:00:00 AM. | |
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event | (P) ACCOUNTING CONTINUED TO 07/03/2012 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 05/23/2012 | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/26/2012 | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/08/2012 | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/2012 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 03/06/2012 09:00:00 AM. | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | (P) ACCOUNTING CONTINUED TO 05/29/2012 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/02/2012 | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/02/2012 | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 01/24/2012 09:00:00 AM. | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 03/06/2012 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | (P) ACCOUNTING CONTINUED TO 03/06/2012 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTLING CURRENT ACCOUNT OF GUARDIAN/CONSERVATOR FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 11/15/2011 | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTLING CURRENT ACCOUNT OF GUARDIAN/CONSERVATOR RECEIVED ON 11/14/2011. | |
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 10/31/2011 | |
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTLING CURRENT ACCOUNT OF GUARDIAN/CONSERVATOR RECEIVED ON 10/31/2011. | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2012 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 182 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS: PETITIONS, OBJECTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS IN OPPOSITION FOR ORDERS THAT ARE FILED AFTER ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTR IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11015862 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10839754. | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND FEES FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 10/21/2011 | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 10/21/2011 | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CONSERVATORSHIP - INVESTIGATION MEMO FILED BY KRUPNIK, MAX ON 05/13/2011 | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND FEES HAS BEEN GRANTED. | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO COURT-APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 5/18/10 | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 05/18/2010 09:00:00 AM. | |
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 05/14/2010 | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 86 - CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATIONS - REVIEW IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10462056. | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 05/13/2010 | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 04/06/2010 | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/24/2010 | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/24/2010 | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 05/18/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO COURT-APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | (P) ACCOUNTING CONTINUED TO 05/18/2010 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/23/2010 | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 03/23/2010 09:00:00 AM. | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/22/2010 | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/22/2010 | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 03/22/2010 | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 02/16/2010 | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 02/03/2010 | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION - OTHER 02/02/2010 09:00:00 AM. | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 01/21/2010 09:00:00 AM. | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | (P) ACCOUNTING CONTINUED TO 03/23/2010 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 01/21/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 12/10/2009 09:00:00 AM. | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) ACCOUNTING CONTINUED TO 01/21/2010 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
(P) PETITION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION - OTHER 12/08/2009 09:00:00 AM. | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION - OTHER CONTINUED TO 02/02/2010 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO COURT-APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 12/8/09 | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 151 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS: PETITIONS, OBJECTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS IN OPPOSITION FOR ORDERS THAT ARE FILED AFTER ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTR IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10526377 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10350250. | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | OBJECTION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 12/04/2009 | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | OBJECTION - AFTER 8/18/03 FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 12/04/2009 | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
(P) PETITION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 151 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS: PETITIONS, OBJECTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS IN OPPOSITION FOR ORDERS THAT ARE FILED AFTER ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTR IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10496946 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10320819. | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION (SUBSEQUENT) (FOR SETTLEMENT) FILED BY GREEN, JASON ON 10/22/2009 | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 12/10/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) ACCOUNTING 10/15/2009 09:00:00 AM. | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO COURT-APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) ACCOUNTING CONTINUED TO 12/10/2009 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 10/01/2009 | |
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10477102 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10300976. | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/23/2009 | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY 09/21/2009 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 68 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS-PROBATE: MOTION, APPLICATION OR OTHER PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING AFTER THE FIRST PAPER; CERTAIN SUBSEQUENT PETITIONS, APPLICATIONS, OR OTHER OPPOSITION IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10474247 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10298121. | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/23/2009 | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY HAS BEEN GRANTED . | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO COURT-APPOINTED JUDGE | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/21/2009 | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/15/2009 | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/15/2009 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/10/2009 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/10/2009 | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/08/2009 | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
(P) ACCOUNTING SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Randall J. Sherman |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND FEES FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 09/01/2009 | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 151 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS: PETITIONS, OBJECTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS IN OPPOSITION FOR ORDERS THAT ARE FILED AFTER ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTR IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10459080 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10282954. | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 09/01/2009 01:30:00 PM. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY CONTINUED TO 09/21/2009 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY 08/24/2009 11:00:00 AM. | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 08/14/2009 | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 07/21/2009 01:30:00 PM. | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/01/2009 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/01/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2009 AT 11:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 07/22/2009 | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 69 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS: PETITIONS, OBJECTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS IN OPPOSITION FOR ORDERS THAT ARE FILED AFTER ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRA IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10429719 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10253593. | |
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 07/02/2009 | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY SCANE, BILL B. ON 06/22/2009 | |
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 06/02/2009 01:45:00 PM. | |
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/21/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/21/2009 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2009 AT 01:45:00 PM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 04/21/2009 01:45:00 PM. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/02/2009 AT 01:45 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY 04/06/2009 11:00:00 AM. | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION | |
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CONSERVATORSHIP - ANNUAL REVIEW REPORT FILED BY WALKER, KARMELL ON 04/07/2009 | |
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAILING FILED BY WALKER, KARMELL ON 04/07/2009 | |
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET FILED BY WALKER, KARMELL ON 04/07/2009 | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 04/06/2009 | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/2009 AT 11:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY CONTINUED TO 04/06/2009 AT 11:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY 03/02/2009 11:00:00 AM. | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 02/24/2009 | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 01/27/2009 | |
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2009 AT 11:00:00 AM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 01/21/2009 | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF POSTING 1/21/09 | |
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 10/22/2008 | |
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 10/14/2008 01:45:00 PM. | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | CONSERVATORSHIP - 6 MONTH REVIEW REPORT FILED BY ORTEGA, NADINA ON 10/07/2008 | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET FILED BY ORTEGA, NADINA ON 10/07/2008 | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION FILED BY ORTEGA, NADINA ON 10/07/2008 | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAILING FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 10/06/2008 | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT - OTHER (CARE ASSESSMENT PLAN) FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 10/06/2008 | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 07/30/2008 | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 07/22/2008 | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 07/15/2008 | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER DESIGNATING PROBATE REFEREE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 05/19/2008 | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS) FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 05/12/2008 | |
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 48.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10108080 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 132447. | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND ($50,000.00) FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 04/29/2008 | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2008 AT 10:00:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTER OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 04/29/2008 | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PROBATE CONSERVATOR (ESTATE/PERSON) FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 04/29/2008 | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 04/29/2008 | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2008 AT 14:00:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/21/2009 AT 01:45:00 PM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/14/2008 AT 01:45:00 PM IN L73 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER. | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR HAS BEEN GRANTED . | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION FOR KRIG GARY NORMAN ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR UPDATED TO GRANTED. | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR 04/04/2008 01:45:00 PM. | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY KRIG, GARY NORMAN ON 04/09/2008 | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE 4/4/08 | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2008 AT 13:45:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. MISCELLANEOUS MATTERS) FOR 11/20/2007 12:00:31 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. APPT CONSERVATOR) FOR 02/05/2008 13:45:00 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. APPT CONSERVATOR) FOR 12/18/2007 13:45:00 | |
February 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CONVERTED BANNER MINUTE ORDER (M.O. APPT CONSERVATOR) FOR 02/19/2008 13:45:00 | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | CONTINUED/OFF CALENDAR. | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR HEARD ON 02/19/2008 AT 13:45:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 02/15/2008 | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OTHER) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 02/15/2008 | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR HEARD ON 02/05/2008 AT 13:45:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | CONTINUED/OFF CALENDAR. | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OTHER) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 02/05/2008 | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OTHER) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 02/01/2008 | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING (NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 02/01/2008 | |
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | CONTINUED/OFF CALENDAR. | |
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR HEARD ON 12/18/2007 AT 13:45:00 AT LAMOREAUX JUSTICE CENTER | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | REPORT - OTHER (MEDICAL REPORT) WAS FILED ON 12/10/2007 | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT ENVELOPE) WAS FILED ON 12/10/2007 | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION - CONSERVATORSHIP (CITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 12/10/2007 | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | TOTAL AMOUNT OF $500 WAS ADDED FOR MKRU FOR THE TIME PERIOD 2007 TO 2008. | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | INITIAL PETITION REPORT WAS FILED ON 12/10/2007 | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE-OTHER) WAS FILED ON 12/10/2007 | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | INVESTIGATOR MEMORANDUM WAS FILED ON 12/10/2007 | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION CODE WAS ENTERED: SUPERVISORY ORDERS | |
November 02, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING (NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 11/02/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM (CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE/COVER SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL REPORT ENVELOPE) WAS FILED ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR (PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION) WAS FILED BY GARY NORMAN KRIG ON 10/29/2007 |