Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MEANEY, CYDNEY (ST/CT) v. MARCANTONIO, CHRISTOPHER
A F85 - Family - Support Petition - C.G.S. 46b-215 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT. Judge DAVID DEE, FSM presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 21, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 08, 2023
Filing Location
Litchfield County, CT
Judge
Hon. DAVID DEE, FSM
Category
F85 - Family - Support Petition - C.G.S. 46b-215
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF IV-D CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF SUPPORT RESULT: DAVID DEE, FSM | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 7/12/2021 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE C. Marcantonio | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC ORDERS - PETITION FOR CHILD SUPPORT (JD-FM-210) | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUPPORT |