Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GOMEZ,W(CT/ST) v. FREYGANG,TAMARA
A F85 - Family - Support Petition - C.G.S. 46b-215 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT. Judge NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA, FSM presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 16, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 18, 2023
Filing Location
Litchfield County, CT
Judge
Hon. NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA, FSM
Category
F85 - Family - Support Petition - C.G.S. 46b-215
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 5/9/2022 J PRICE, FSM | |
May 09, 2022 | Hearing | ||
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/2/2022 J PRICE, FSM | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE MATTERS RESULT: Granted 5/2/2022 J PRICE, FSM | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER/FILE RECEIPT FORM NO JD-CL-52 | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF LITCHFIELD | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF WATERBURY | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 4/21/2022 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES RESULT: Order 5/9/2022 J PRICE, FSM | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF SUPPORT RESULT: NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA, FSM | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 10/28/2016 NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA, FSM | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUPPORT RESULT: Judgment 10/28/2016 NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA, FSM |