Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PECK, KERILYN v. ST. ONGE, JR, WALTER
A V01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT. Judge Ann E. Lynch presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 28, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Litchfield County, CT
Category
V01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver and/or Passenger(s) vs. Driver(s)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: Nov 30, 2022OFFER OF COMPROMISE
Date: Nov 02, 2022ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: Sep 20, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: Jul 14, 2022AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS
Date: Jun 14, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: Jun 13, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/8/2022 HON ANN LYNCH
Date: Jun 08, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/1/2021 HON ANN LYNCH
Date: Dec 01, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 9/16/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: Sep 16, 2021DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: Sep 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: Sep 09, 2021ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/8/2021 HON ANN LYNCH
Date: Sep 08, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 28, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE PLAINTIFF | |
November 17, 2022 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | OFFER OF COMPROMISE | |
September 27, 2022 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT Answer to Second Amended Complaint | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS | |
June 14, 2022 | Remote Status Conference | ||
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/8/2022 HON ANN LYNCH | |
June 06, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-13 #013 | ||
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY Motion to Substitute Defendant for the Executor of Def's Estate RESULT: Granted 6/8/2022 HON ANN LYNCH | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF DEATH | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/1/2021 HON ANN LYNCH | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 RESULT: Granted 12/1/2021 HON ANN LYNCH | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE re I&P directed to Plaintiff | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 9/16/2021 BY THE CLERK | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6 | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES Scheduling Order 9-8-21 RESULT: Accepted 9/8/2021 HON ANN LYNCH | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/8/2021 HON ANN LYNCH | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 9/16/2021 BY THE CLERK | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE Notice of I&P to D-St.Inge, Jr. | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE Request D&P | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |