Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC A/A/O CREDITSHOP LLC v. FECTO, IRMTRAUD
C40 - Contracts - Collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT. Judge Ann E. Lynch presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 25, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Litchfield County, CT
Category
C40 - Contracts - Collections
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER Stipulated Judgment Order RESULT: Granted 11/30/2021 HON ANN LYNCH
Date: Nov 30, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: Nov 30, 2021APPEARANCE
Date: Nov 15, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/8/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: Sep 08, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 25, 2021SUMMONS
Date: Jun 25, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER Stipulated Judgment Order RESULT: Granted 11/30/2021 HON ANN LYNCH | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON ANN LYNCH | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 11/30/2021 HON ANN LYNCH | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/8/2021 BY THE CLERK | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 9/8/2021 BY THE CLERK | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |