Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHARLOTTE HUNGERFORD HOSPITAL v. SPECTRUM HEALTHCARE, LLC
C40 - Contracts - Collections case was filed by Charlotte Hungerford Hospital, represented by Hertzmark Crean & Lahey Llp, against Spectrum Healthcare, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT. Judge John D. Moore presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 11, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 22, 2023
Filing Location
Litchfield County, CT
Category
C40 - Contracts - Collections
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Bankruptcy
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/3/2016 HON JOHN MOORE
Date: Nov 03, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 11, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 11, 2016SUMMONS
Date: Oct 11, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/3/2016 HON JOHN MOORE | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR STAY BY REASON OF BANKRUPTCY RESULT: Granted 11/3/2016 HON JOHN MOORE | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |