Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Fosnot, Sandra v. Estate Of Delbert Eugene Fosnot
A Breach Of Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dolores County, CO. Judge William Young Furse presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 12, 2023
Filing Location
Dolores County, CO
Judge
Category
Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Hearing
Date: May 16, 2023Proposed Order
Date: May 16, 2023Motion
Date: May 16, 2023Proposed Order
Date: Mar 15, 2023Order
Date: Mar 15, 2023Order
Date: Feb 14, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: Jan 06, 2023Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: Jan 04, 2023Order
Date: Dec 22, 2022Entry of Appearance
Date: Nov 15, 2022Answer
Date: Nov 15, 2022Summons
Date: Oct 24, 2022Waiver of Service
Date: Oct 03, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Sep 29, 2022Complaint
Date: Sep 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Non-Appearance Hearing |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Re: Motion to Approve Stipulation | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Approve Stipulation | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1- Attach to Motion to Approve Stipulation |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Alternative Dispute Resolution/Mediation Order |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Civil Court Trial Scheduling Order |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Notice of Status Hearing |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Print N/A |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order - Case Management Order |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document) Proposed Order - Case Management |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Notice of Hearing |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |