Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jeffrey Gagne, filed a(n) Other case against Boulder County District Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Boulder County, CO, . Boulder County, CO Superior Courts with Andrew Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBoulder County, CO |
|
Order(Related Document)
Date: February 14, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: December 06, 2018Filing Other
Date: November 21, 2018Certificate
Date: November 11, 2018Certificate
Date: February 07, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 08, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: February 14, 2019Petition(Related Document)
Date: September 11, 2018Order(Related Document)
Date: December 06, 2018Notice
Date: October 15, 2018Proposed Order
Date: September 13, 2018Certificate
Date: November 02, 2018Filing Other(Related Document)
Date: September 11, 2018Filing Other
Date: October 18, 2018Response(Related Document)
Date: October 10, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter From the San Diego County District Attorney's Office in Opposition to Defendant's Petition to De-Register | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Motion to Withdraw Petition to Discontinue Sex Offender Registration and Motion to Vacate Hearing |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Re: Motion to Withdraw Petition to Discontinue Sex Offender Registration and Motion to Vacate Hearing |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion(Related Document) Motion to Withdraw Petition to Discontinue Sex Offender Registration and Motion to Vacate Hearing |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit C: Domestic Return Receipt and Certified Mail Receipt- City of Longmont Police Services Division |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit A: Domestic Return Receipt and Certified Mail Receipt- Boulder County District Attorrney |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit D: Domestic Return Receipt and Certified Mail Receipt- San Diego County District Attorney |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit B: Domestic Return Receipt and Certified Mail Receipt- San Diego Sheriff's Dept. Licensing Division |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service - Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.