Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State of Wisconsin vs. Montrell Virgil Lee Hitt
On June 20, 2022 a traffic forfeiture case was filed in the jurisdiction of Rock County, WI.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 15, 2022
Filing Location
Rock County, WI
Category
Traffic Forfeiture
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Meyer, Stephen D. |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing returned for Hitt, Montrell Virgil Lee | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Video conferencing | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default judgment entered
Judge: Meyer, Stephen D. |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Intake
Judge: Meyer, Stephen D. |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Meyer, Stephen D. |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation filed |