Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Voluntary Amortization of Debts of Amy J Spindler
On November 06, 2019 a civil case was filed by Spindler, Amy J, in the jurisdiction of Marathon County, WI. Judge Falstad, Jill N presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 06, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 29, 2022
Filing Location
Marathon County, WI
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for dismissal
Judge: Falstad, Jill N |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissed
Judge: Falstad, Jill N |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Prop. order for dismissal | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Falstad, Jill N |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition granted
Judge: Falstad, Jill N |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Report | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic Filing Notice | |
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Falstad, Jill N |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit |