Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS VS BLACK ET UX
A Col Collection case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 25, 2023
Filing Location
Snohomish County, WA
Category
COL Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy of Writ of Garnishment |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Release of Writ of Garnishment issued 3/26/16 to Home Depot USA |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ 8: ANSWER TO WRIT; |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment -: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 7: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Default -: ORDER OF DEFAULT; COMMISSIONER SUSAN C. GAER; |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment 5: JUDGMENT; |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 4: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 6: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |