Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN RE DUANE G HUGHES
On July 31, 2020 an estate case was filed in the jurisdiction of King County, WA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 30, 2021
Filing Location
King County, WA
Category
Estate
Status
Closed
Parties
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RCP - Receipt(s) |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DCLCMP - Declaration of Completion |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CRDCLM - Creditor's Claim |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CRDCLM - Creditor's Claim |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
DCLR - Declaration REGARDING ASCERTAINING CREDITORS |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | AFPUB - Affidavit of Publication |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
OA - Oath AARON D HUGHES |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet KENT AREA |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | LTRTS - Letters Testamentary |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
CP - Copy DEATH CERTIFICATE |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
OA - Oath AARON D HUGHES |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | PTPOSD - Petition for Probate of Will for Order Adjudicating Solvency Directing Ad |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORGLASN - Order Granting Letters of Administration Adjudicate Solvency with Nonintervention Powers AARON D HUGHES / BOND WAIVED |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | PTPBW - Petition for Probate of Will |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | LWAT - Last Will and Testament |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet |
|