Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SOK ET ANO VS VANDERMOST
On July 31, 2020 a tort /motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of King County, WA. Judge Judge Berns presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 30, 2021
Filing Location
King County, WA
Judge
Hon. Judge Berns
Category
Tort /Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Briefs, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Joint Statement of Evidence | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Dispositive Pretrial Motions | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Exchange Witness & Exhibit Lists & Documentary Exhibits | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Joint Confirmation of Trial Readiness | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Engaging in Alternative Dispute Resolution | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Discovery Cutoff | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEADLINE for Jury Demand | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Change in Trial Date | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Possible Additional Witnesses | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Possible Primary Witnesses | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Motions to Change Case Assignment Area | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Confirmation of Joinder if not subject to Arbitration | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Filing Statement of Arbitrability | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CMPTMV - Complaint for Tort - Motor Vehicle |
|