Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF WASHINGTON VS PAIGE, CARNELL
A Criminal - Completed/Re-Completed case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of King County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
November 28, 2023
Filing Location
King County, WA
Category
Criminal - Completed/Re-Completed
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDSMWP - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORSK - Order Striking |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | OMAPA - Omnibus Application of Prosecuting Attorney |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORSTD - Order Setting Trial Date |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORQ - Order Quashing |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORFTA - Order for Failure to Appear |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORFTA - Order for Failure to Appear |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NTHG - Notice of Hearing |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORFTA - Order for Failure to Appear |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORST - Order Setting |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDYDC - Order Denying Drug Court |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MINS - Minutes Arraignment hearing |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CRML - Certificate of Mailing |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NTA - Notice of Arraignment |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | ORISM - Order for Issuance of Summons |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | INFO - Information |
|