Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stoney Ridge Phase B Section 1 Homeowners Associations Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Basham George Verner, against Santos , Juan R, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2020 |
CategoryHome Owner Association Disputes |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeCondominium |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: January 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CVD:DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: BURGESS, DON) FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff STONEY RIDGE PHASE B SECTION 1 HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS INC Party 2: Defendant SANTOS, JUAN R | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff STONEY RIDGE PHASE B SECTION 1 HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS INC | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PROPOSED ORDER | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NO ANSWER DEFAULT JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff STONEY RIDGE PHASE B SECTION 1 HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS INC | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION-JUAN R. SANTOS Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant SANTOS, JUAN R | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff STONEY RIDGE PHASE B SECTION 1 HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS INC | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff STONEY RIDGE PHASE B SECTION 1 HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.