Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
INRE: T D BLOOMER vs South
A Suit Affecting Parent Child Relationship Iv-D case was filed in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2013
Last Refreshed
July 31, 2023
Filing Location
Tarrant County, TX
Category
SUIT AFFECTING PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP IV-D
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Other Parent-Child
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE OF NONSUIT (PETITION)
Date: Jul 16, 2014CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: Jul 16, 2014DOCKET SHEET
Date: Jul 16, 2014AJS ORDER (HRG 07/15/2014 8:30AM)
Date: Apr 15, 2014IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr 2 RET EXEC(IMELIA LASHUN G
Date: Jan 30, 2014IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr 3 RET UNEXEC(TUSCANY ECAR
Date: Jan 24, 2014IV-D OPET ORIGINAL PETITION IN SAPCR (AOP)
Date: Dec 30, 2013INFORMATION SHEET
Date: Dec 30, 2013IV-D Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON TUSCANY ECAROH
Date: Dec 30, 2013IV-D Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON IMELIA LASHUN
Date: Dec 30, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT (PETITION) | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | AJ'S ORDER (HRG 07/15/2014 @ 8:30AM) | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 5, dated 01/29/2014 | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 7, dated 01/30/2014 | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 2, dated 12/30/2013 | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 3, dated 12/30/2013 | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 1, dated 12/30/2013 | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr# 2 RET EXEC(IMELIA LASHUN G | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Service fee for # 2 | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Service fee for # 3 | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr# 3 RET UNEXEC(TUSCANY E'CAR | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | IV-D OPET ORIGINAL PETITION IN SAPCR (AOP) | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | INFORMATION SHEET | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON TUSCANY E'CAROH | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON IMELIA LASHUN |