Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LORY WEATHERS and SUZANNE BUGGS, Individually and as Representatives of the ESTATE OF AVERY KADEEM WEATHERS, Deceased and MEYUNKIA GIPSON, as Next Friend of Z.W., A.W. and A.W., Minors and TEQUILA FOSTER, as Next Friend of A.W., a Minor VS. CAMPBELL…
A Civil Case - Other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX. Judge Kerry L. Russell presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 06, 2023
Last Refreshed
June 18, 2024
Filing Location
Smith County, TX
Filing Court House
7th District Court
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) | |
September 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Baker's OA to Pltfs' 3rd Amd Petition and Mtn for Leave to Designate Responsible Criminal 3rd Party Original Answer |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplement to Mewbourne Oil Company's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Supplement |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mewbourne Oil Company's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Mewbourne Oil Company's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Notice of Hearing |
|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
GSM's OA to Pltfs 3rd Am Petition and Mtn for Leave to Designate Responsible Criminal 3rd Party Original Answer |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mewbourne Oil Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Petition Answer |
|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Defendants Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, LLC's & Patterson-UTI Energy, Inc.'s Original Answer Original Answer |
|
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served - Wesley H. Baker Citation Returned Served |
|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served - GSM Oilfield Services, Inc. Citation Returned Served |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of the Deposition of Timothy Thomas Reporter's Certification |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served - Patterson-UTI Energy, Inc. Citation Returned Served |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Third Amended Petition Amended Petition |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Second Amended Petition Amended Petition |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE THIRD PARTY Order Granting Motion for Leave |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dft's Unopposed Mtn for Leave to Desingate RTP Motion |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
WEATHERS-CIVIL CASE JOINT QUESTIONNAIRE Joint Questionnaire |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mewbourne Oil's Ans to Pltfs' 1st am Petition Original Answer |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE Amended Petition |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed-To Confidentialty and Protective Order Protective Order |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint_Mtn_for_Entry_of_Parties__Agreed_Confidentiality Motion |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
1. Transfer Certificate Dallas County Certificate |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
19. Court Notice of Close Case -D. L. Barger, filed 4-5-2023 Transfer From Other County |